Financial history MOULTON PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1032436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £56.23k £89.86k £58.87k £67.17k £65.98k
Total expenditure £58.57k £84.68k £66.18k £61.22k £65.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £42.83k N/A
Income from government grants £39.53k £80.32k £38.62k N/A N/A