Accounts and annual returns COXHEATH PRESCHOOL GROUP

Charity Number: 1032440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 August 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 August 2021 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 July 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 July 2020 24 days late Download Open in new window