Financial history COXHEATH PRESCHOOL GROUP

Charity Number: 1032440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £91.59k £84.20k £73.25k £99.04k £1.11m
Total expenditure £83.85k £79.19k £72.01k £91.13k £113.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £974
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.45k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £104.38k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £109.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.21k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0