ROTARY CLUB OF CHADDERTON AND FAILSWORTH TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity raises Funds through an annual dinner hosted by sports celebrities, a Father Christmas Sleigh and public collections at super markets. It is the policy of the club that 100% of all proceeds are donated to local causes. To this end the club uses contact with the local authority to seek out deserving applicants for funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oldham
Governance
- 02 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Spratt | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER FRYER | Trustee | 13 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tony Wright | Trustee | 13 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.46k | £5.01k | £6.66k | £6.45k | £11.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.31k | £6.72k | £5.42k | £2.25k | £11.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2025 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME IN THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITITION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWBANK COACH HOUSE
OLDHAM ROAD
HEYSIDE ROYTON OLDHAM
NO
NO
OL2 6NE
- Phone:
- 07530311025
- Email:
- wrighties@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window