ROTARY CLUB OF STOKESLEY TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide supporting activities in the local community, raise money for charitable causes, support individuals on educational and training activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 02 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM HEAVISIDE | Chair | 06 September 2022 |
|
|||||
David Hill | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Perry Graham | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judy Kitching MBE | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHANDLER | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.89k | £5.65k | £26.23k | £28.88k | £27.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.70k | £5.40k | £15.17k | £19.29k | £30.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME IN THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Station Nurseries
Station Road
Stokesley
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS9 7AB
- Phone:
- 01642700462
- Email:
- stokesleyrc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window