ST JOHN'S PLAYGROUP (BILTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school playgroup with the main aim of providing affordable early education for children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £73,672 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Philipson | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Dickinson | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Kay | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Cook | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Spurr | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Deaton | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.10k | £105.30k | £102.47k | £102.32k | £101.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.63k | £97.32k | £105.39k | £97.57k | £92.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £66.81k | £87.51k | £76.31k | £79.96k | £73.67k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2021 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2021 | 360 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John's Church Hall
Bilton Lane
HARROGATE
North Yorkshire
HG1 3DT
- Phone:
- 01423509141
- Email:
- stjohnsplaygroup1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window