FIRST STEPS MOTHER AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We meet on Wednesday mornings at Long Bredy Village Hall in term-time. Children up to the age of 4 make new friends and enjoy playing with a large number of resources. Parents/carers have the opportunity to meet & chat.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2008
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 23 February 1994: Standard registration
- FIRST STEPS PARENT AND TODDLER GROUP (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL MALTBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIA JAYNE MALTBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMANTHA CLARE DAUBENEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REBECCA LANSDALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.48k | £727 | £445 | £530 | £390 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.44k | £478 | £517 | £681 | £382 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1794 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1794 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDE STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window