Financial history COLERNE C E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1032473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.07k £3.95k £6.20k £8.56k £9.59k
Total expenditure £5.99k £8.33k £7.41k £5.92k £10.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A