Ocean Conservation Trust Limited

Charity number: 1032491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advance the education of the public in, and promote the conservation of, living marine and freshwater aquatic organisms by the provision of an aquarium and museum and other programmes of education and research and to disseminate the useful results of such research for the benefit of the public

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • Ocean Conservation Trust Limited (Working name)
  • NATIONAL MARINE AQUARIUM LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Lomas Chair 28 April 2014
None on record
Olivia McLaughlin Trustee 31 March 2025
None on record
Gregory Lawrence Trustee 31 March 2025
None on record
Paul Cox Trustee 31 March 2025
None on record
Joseph Patrick Lavery Trustee 31 March 2025
None on record
Duncan Vaughan Trustee 18 December 2024
None on record
Charlotte Davies Trustee 04 April 2024
None on record
Matej PFAJFAR Trustee 10 February 2021
None on record
Professor Jeremy Alan Roberts Trustee 22 August 2019
None on record
Mr K Lewins Trustee 03 December 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £4.12m £3.19m £5.22m £6.40m £6.98m
Total expenditure £4.43m £4.12m £4.45m £5.68m £6.69m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £90.66k £217.89k £124.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.96m £1.55m £2.64m £2.62m £3.27m
Income - Other trading activities £1.03m £498.29k £705.16k £1.14m £1.36m
Income - Charitable activities £958.63k £965.74k £1.61m £2.25m £2.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £178.86k £172.97k £263.91k £383.00k £273.33k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.17m £3.22m £3.51m £4.75m £5.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.27m £235.95k £282.67k £101.00k £1.28m
Expenditure - Governance £46.39k £118.08k £72.90k £81.00k £95.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.84k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £663.15k £663.18k £837.00k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Own use assets £9.11m £8.49m £8.00m £7.75m £7.57m
Long-term investments £4 £4 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £878.53k £1.35m £2.61m £3.81m £3.98m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £579.52k £1.35m £1.36m £1.59m £1.30m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 07 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 29 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 14 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 14 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 26 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 26 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 24 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 24 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NATIONAL MARINE AQUARIUM
ROPE WALK
PLYMOUTH
PL4 0LF
Phone:
03001020300