FIRST STEP PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playgroup that takes pre-school children aged 2 years to 5 years with a maximum of 26 children per session.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 02 February 1994: Standard registration
- 04 December 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.64k | £79.64k | £71.12k | £53.86k | £50.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.29k | £70.74k | £68.73k | £63.46k | £50.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 03 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 03 April 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 13 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 13 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 06 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 06 April 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/06/1993 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window