FRIENDS OF THE CEFNI HOSPITAL - CYFEILLION YSBYTY CEFNI
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MEMBERS/VOLUNTEERS SERVE CUPS OF TEA TO THE VISITORS ON APPROX 4 DAYS PER WK AND OCCASIONALLY HOLD A FUND RAISING EVENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 02 February 1994: Standard registration
- 08 May 2013: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE CEFNI HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2007 | 29/02/2008 | 28/02/2009 | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £977 | £597 | £11 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £740 | £535 | £215 | £3.31k | £3.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | 16 February 2012 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 13 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
LLANGEFNI DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window