Falmouth Surf Life Saving Club

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Surf Life Saving Service and Associated Training Facilities. Recreation, fitness and health through life saving and its associated activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £828 from 828 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 11 February 1994: Standard registration
- FALMOUTH SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB (Working name)
- FALMOUTH INSHORE RESCUE AND SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nikki Jane Brierley | Chair | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Cadman | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Mary Shannon | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280 | £823 | £690 | £8.49k | £11.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12k | £823 | £1.58k | £10.88k | £6.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £828 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD DECEMBER 1993 as amended on 17 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO SAVE LIFE, WHETHER BY PREVENTION OR BY RESCUE, FROM THE BEACH
Area of benefit
MAENPORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill Cottage
Budock Water
FALMOUTH
Cornwall
TR11 5DJ
- Phone:
- 07909800576
- Email:
- nick.cadman@gmail.com
- Website:
-
falmouthslsc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window