Financial history RADIPOLE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1032562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £99.80k £101.33k £110.59k £104.13k £106.36k
Total expenditure £102.09k £99.03k £115.15k £115.08k £107.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £82.69k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A