Financial history KNIGHTS CIRCLE FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF SPIRITUAL AWARENESS AND HEALING

Charity Number: 1032596
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/02/2013 01/02/2014 01/02/2015 01/02/2016 01/02/2017
Total gross income £3.26k £3.56k £2.32k £2.94k £2.21k
Total expenditure £3.03k £3.05k £2.30k £1.03k £3.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A