HAMPSHIRE FOUNDATION FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is to advance the education in music of young people up to the age of 25 in Hampshire (including Southampton and Portsmouth) who are educated principally in the schools and colleges within the said County.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
Governance
- 04 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Chapman MBE | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jill Larner | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Jesty | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES CARPENTER | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CARL CLAUSEN | Trustee | 21 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN EVES | Trustee | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEREK GEOFFREY ANTHONY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY LOUISA CAROLINE PORTAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.86k | £2.71k | £3.90k | £4.07k | £4.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.98k | £963 | £1.08k | £3.86k | £4.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JANUARY 1994, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 26 JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN MUSIC OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UP TO THE AGE OF 25 WHO RESIDE IN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE, INCLUDING THE CITIES OF PORTSMOUTH AND SOUTHAMPTON OR WHO ARE EDUCATED PRINCIPALLY IN THE SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES WITHIN THE SAID COUNTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Hampshire Music Service
Unit 1- Bar End Industrial Estate
Bar End Road
WINCHESTER
Hampshire
SO23 9NR
- Phone:
- 02380652037
- Email:
- chair@hfym.org.uk
- Website:
-
hfymawards.hantsmusic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window