Financial history CLWYD WELSH PONY AND COB ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1032609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.96k £1.76k £7.02k £8.65k £7.57k
Total expenditure £6.89k £595 £3.45k £7.45k £7.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A