HARPENDEN VILLAGE ROTARY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable activities carried out by members of Harpenden Village Rotary Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Total income includes £700 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 10 February 1994: Standard registration
- 21 June 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.51k | £45.34k | £48.75k | £56.03k | £53.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.98k | £44.63k | £48.75k | £54.48k | £45.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £700 | £700 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 10 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 10 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 07 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | 07 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 16 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 16 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 10 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | 10 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window