GRASSHOPPER CLUB

Charity number: 1032694
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pre-school play group for children in and around Castle Donington

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £191,850
Total expenditure: £225,257

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 February 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Melanie Graham Chair
None on record
Emma Gray-Robins Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
WENDY LYNNE WILKINSON Trustee
None on record
SARA BUCKNALL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £207.30k £216.85k £181.72k £211.61k £191.85k
Total expenditure £200.49k £174.22k £189.91k £211.89k £225.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £174.00k £95.43k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 April 2025 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 April 2025 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 March 2024 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 March 2024 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
School House
Mount Pleasant
Castle Donington
Derby
DE74 2LN
Phone:
07419215293