INDIAN COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To serve the Asian community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Coventry City
Governance
- 08 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AVTAR SINGH SANGHERA | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|||||
SARWAN SINGH | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
kulwant singh saini | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
surinder jit singh | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mehar Singh Kang | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
sawarn singh | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rashpal Singh | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.18k | £106.96k | £230.38k | £168.92k | £168.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.56k | £49.61k | £105.54k | £131.12k | £130.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.18k | £19.25k | £1.59k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 182 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/01/1989 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/1991 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/1993 AS AMENDED ON 23/07/1993 AS AMENDED ON 12/12/1996 AS AMENDED ON 28/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 09/05/2009 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2015
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF COVENTRY CONCERNING GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY IN A MULTI RACIAL, MULTI CULTURAL AND MULTI FAITH SOCIETY. 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION. 3. TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POVERTY OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
INDIAN COMMUNITY CENTRE
243 CROSS ROAD
COVENTRY
CV6 5GP
- Phone:
- 02476680899
- Email:
- ICC243@YAHOO.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window