FRIENDS OF NEWARK ORCHARD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Quiz Nights, Grand Draws, Sponsored Events, Christmas Fayre and other fund raising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 08 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Chambers | Chair | 06 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Blundell | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Pannell | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Leigh-Browne | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Carter | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Quanbrough | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Hunsley | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAURA REDFERN | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|||||
MARGOT TYERS | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CLARE STOKES JP | Trustee | 06 October 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.56k | £4.48k | £4.30k | £546 | £3.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.72k | £937 | £6.27k | £1.42k | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 11 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 1993. AS AMENDED 1ST APRIL 1996 AND 30 OCTOBER 1996.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND/OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES WHO ARE ATTENDERS OR PROSPECTIVE ATTENDERS OF THE ORCHARD SCHOOL NEWARK
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWARK ORCHARD SCHOOL
LONDON ROAD
BALDERTON
NEWARK
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG24 3AL
- Phone:
- 01636 682255
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window