BISHOPS TACHBROOK PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To care for and provide education for pre-school children giving a broad range of learning activities for personal development and transition into school. To further the professional development of the trained staff and welcome parents and carers into the setting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 08 March 1994: Standard registration
- 29 June 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 29 June 2018: Funds transferred to 1164344 BISHOPS TACHBROOK PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY
- BISHOPS TACHBROOK PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.91k | £78.69k | £70.11k | £76.09k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.56k | £86.05k | £77.10k | £82.10k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £47.35k | £46.29k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 25 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 27 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 27 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 29 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 29 June 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 25 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 25 June 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 FEBRUARY 1992 AS AMENDED 6 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window