Financial history MARSDEN MECHANICS HALL MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1033019
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £24.48k £30.31k £30.68k £59.13k £21.55k
Total expenditure £23.09k £30.12k £30.56k £45.94k £38.23k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 £0