WINSTER C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1033033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Works to enhance the educational environment and activities of Winster Primary School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £10,518
Total expenditure: £2,771

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 February 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • P T F A (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Greatorex Chair 19 October 2023
None on record
Kerry McClay Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
David Brown Trustee 07 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.36k £909 £31 £227 £10.52k
Total expenditure £2.14k £203 £204 £1.20k £2.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £983

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 31 July 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 13 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 11 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Winster C Of E Voluntary Controlled Primary School
Wensley Road
Winster
MATLOCK
Derbyshire
DE4 2DH
Phone:
01629 650238