FRIENDS OF DORE ABBEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity's current activities continue to ensure the continuity of worship in Dore Abbey. The (12) Building involves an on-going expense of fabric maintenance. Guided tours continue to promote the education of the public in the historical & archaeological treasures of our ancient church. Music, drama events are organised during the summer months for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 09 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Patricia Spens | Chair |
|
||||||
Lynda Cecil | Trustee | 23 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marie Ann Morgan-Jones | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Whitlock | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ISABELLE GEORGE | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phebe Lloyd | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
LEONIE HOWARTH | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.27k | £17.85k | £78.88k | £14.69k | £14.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.57k | £77.81k | £48.39k | £32.00k | £5.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE RELIGION (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.MAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
47A Crossways
Peterchurch
HEREFORD
HR2 0TQ
- Phone:
- 01981550733
- Email:
- philippaspens@live.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window