FAREHAM WEST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give assistance regarding the provision of Scouting within Fareham West Scout District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
275 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 23 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eric Martin Williams | Chair | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Owen Crowe | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JEFFERIES | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Donald Robert Cannadine | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elizabeth Anne Ashley | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dowman-Tucker | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Mark Elbourn | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Greenfield | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM HARVEY-ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.93k | £62.00k | £64.65k | £85.02k | £87.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.58k | £49.47k | £61.79k | £92.23k | £80.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Oaklands Gardens
FAREHAM
Hampshire
PO14 4LG
- Phone:
- 01489589457
- Email:
- fun.el@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window