Accounts and annual returns VILLAGE HALL, BOTESDALE, SUFFOLK.

Charity number: 1033068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 07 March 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 15 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 09 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required