VILLAGE HALL, BOTESDALE, SUFFOLK.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management and maintenance of Botesdale Village Hall for community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 February 1994: Standard registration
- BOTESDALE VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Mills | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Edwards | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pam Clarke | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Clive Isbell | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
LEEANN JACKSON-EVE | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM NEIL FREEMAN | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Bishop | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Shurmer | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANITA BURNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM Boden SARGEANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN ELIZABETH HAILS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.70k | £14.40k | £10.10k | £13.13k | £9.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.19k | £15.47k | £11.69k | £10.45k | £12.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £850 | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED EXECUTED 17 DECEMBER 1993 as amended on 16 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY DEMISED SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL TO BE KNOWN AS THE BOTESDALE VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE AND OF THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BOTESDALE IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK (HREINAFTER CALLED " THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE PARISH OF BOTESDALE IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ENTRY
DISS ROAD
BOTESDALE
DISS
IP22 1DD
- Phone:
- 01379890138
- Email:
- sargeantwill@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window