Trustees VILLAGE HALL, BOTESDALE, SUFFOLK.
Charity number: 1033068

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Mills | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Edwards | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pam Clarke | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Clive Isbell | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
LEEANN JACKSON-EVE | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM NEIL FREEMAN | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Bishop | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Shurmer | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANITA BURNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM Boden SARGEANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN ELIZABETH HAILS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.