Financial history SURVIVING CHRISTMAS

Charity number: 1033117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.52k £26.51k £23.54k £28.76k £30.85k
Total expenditure £36.89k £24.52k £29.93k £27.37k £31.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A