SURVIVING CHRISTMAS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of hospitality (meeting space, food, clothing and other services) over the three day Christmas period; provision and delivery of hampers to those in need; provision of food vouchers to those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 17 February 1994: Standard registration
- SURVIVING CHRISTMAS (HASTINGS AND ROTHER DISTRICT) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Morgan | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Sargent | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Nugent | Trustee | 18 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hall | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Elizabeth Patricia Fox-Peters | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angus Warwick Peters | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caroline Peck | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Kennedy | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Louise Moss | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Friend | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Murphy | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Megan Skinner | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Adam Newington | Trustee | 24 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
LIONEL REGINALD PARR | Trustee | 24 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.52k | £26.51k | £23.54k | £28.76k | £30.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.89k | £24.52k | £29.93k | £27.37k | £31.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 DECEMBER 1993, AS AMENDED 23RD FEBRUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT WHETHER TEMPORARILY OR NOT IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF HASTINGS OR THE ROTHER DISTRICT IN THE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING,THE PROVISION FOR SUCH PERSONS OF FOOD AND SHELTER OR ALLOWANCES OR VOUCHERS THEREFOR,THE PROVISION OF SUCH PERSONS OF CLOTHING AND HEATING OR ALLOWANCES OR VOUCHERS THEREFOR
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF HASTINGS OR THE ROTHER DIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
124 College Road
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
TN40 1TW
- Phone:
- 07834386278
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window