Trustees SURVIVING CHRISTMAS
Charity number: 1033117

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Morgan | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Sargent | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Nugent | Trustee | 18 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hall | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Elizabeth Patricia Fox-Peters | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angus Warwick Peters | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caroline Peck | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Kennedy | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Louise Moss | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Friend | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Murphy | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Megan Skinner | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Adam Newington | Trustee | 24 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
LIONEL REGINALD PARR | Trustee | 24 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.