MEREWORTH PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide education for pre-school children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 24 February 1994: Standard registration
- 22 November 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 22 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1186449 MEREWORTH PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
- MEREWORTH PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.72k | £92.52k | £85.73k | £90.37k | £92.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.66k | £88.60k | £98.14k | £86.33k | £82.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 131 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 November 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 16 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 16 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 2 AUGUST 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window