SOUTHGATE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 February 1994: Standard registration
- SOUTHGATE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Alcock | Chair | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.13k | £143.48k | £125.48k | £143.52k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.43k | £132.07k | £138.31k | £167.82k | £13.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £112.03k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BURY ST EDMUNDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southgate Pre-School
Steward Road
Bury St Edmunds
Suffolk
IP33 2PW
- Phone:
- 01284703181
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window