Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF COULSDON MANOR TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1033154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.46k £8.57k £16.65k £8.90k £9.98k
Total expenditure £14.25k £8.88k £17.29k £8.93k £7.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A