ROTARY CLUB OF COULSDON MANOR TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity raises funds by holding Golf matches, by having Christmas carols collectionsand by organising the annual Old Coulsdon Village Fair and by other various ways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 18 February 1994: Standard registration
- ROTARY CLUB OF COULSDON MANOR (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hamish Robertson | Chair | 01 July 2003 |
|
|
||||
Clive Stechman | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Rowan | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Paulson | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Malcolm Newman | Trustee | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher Power | Trustee | 04 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.46k | £8.57k | £16.65k | £8.90k | £9.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.25k | £8.88k | £17.29k | £8.93k | £7.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 1 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO APPLY BOTH INCOME AND CAPITAL TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE,COULSDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Oakwood Avenue
Purley
CR8 1AQ
- Phone:
- 02086603735
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window