SUPPORTERS AND TEACHERS AT RUISLIP GARDENS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1033156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School PTA.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £3,416
Total expenditure: £3,425

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hillingdon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF RUISLIP GARDENS SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephanie Barrell Chair 28 February 2025
None on record
Joanne Rhodes Trustee 28 February 2025
None on record
William Clark Trustee 28 February 2025
None on record
Natalie Kenny Dawson Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Katie Rycraft Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Kirsty Lynas Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Gemma Baranowski Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Joy Clark Trustee 30 July 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.98k £6.24k £1.40k £253 £3.42k
Total expenditure £6.11k £10.66k £4.37k £688 £3.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 July 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ruislip Gardens Primary School
Stafford Road
Ruislip
HA4 6PD
Phone:
01895632895
Website:

ruislipgardensschool.co.uk