NEST - THE NEW START TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal aim is to build earth homes for orphaned children and their communities in the developing world. NEST trains volunteers to teach communities how to build earth homes; it provides funding to supply materials and it works in partnership with other organisations to deliver a programme of education and training for sustainable living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kenya
- South Africa
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 18 February 1994: Standard registration
- 01 September 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NEST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 23 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 9 DECEMBER 1997 AND 21 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR ORPHANED CHILDREN AND THEIR COMMUNITIES AND THOSE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT, IN PRACTICE, ESSEX AND SOUTHERN ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window