SUNSHINE PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Pre-School has been established for over 30 years. It serves the community of Odd Down and surrounding areas near Bath. It is situated in the Rush Hill United Reformed Church and has the benefit of its own accommodation and a small grassed area for outside activities. It is open from 9.15am-1.15pm Mon-Fri in term time. We are Ofsted regulated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
Total income includes £70,407 from 25 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 24 February 1994: Standard registration
- 17 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SUNSHINE PRE-SCHOOL (ODD DOWN) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.98k | £82.90k | £72.19k | £89.72k | £118.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.96k | £86.31k | £85.15k | £85.13k | £137.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £750 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £73.73k | £66.60k | £65.33k | £79.26k | £70.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window