HAINFORD PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE EDUCATION/TRAINING FOR CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY AGE. A PRE-SCHOOL RUN IN CONJUNCTION WITH PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £68,767 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 24 February 1994: Standard registration
- 13 December 2019: Funds received from 1021102 SCHOOL LANE PRE-SCHOOL
- HAINFORD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosina Monsey | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Laing | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Claire Ferris | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Faye Louise Layton | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Revell-Betts | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.70k | £60.51k | £54.46k | £54.29k | £93.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.88k | £57.62k | £57.38k | £66.19k | £92.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £46.07k | N/A | £39.62k | £68.77k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 July 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 July 2023 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 June 2024 | 747 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 25 June 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 25 June 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/12/1991 AS AMENDED ON 05/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jasmine Cottage
16 School Road
Frettenham
Norwich
Norfolk
NR12 7LL
- Phone:
- 07912607802
- Website:
-
hainfordpreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window