THOMAS LANE WOMEN'S CLUB
Charity Number: 1033195
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
education and social
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Total income: £1,530
Total expenditure: £1,660
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Liverpool City
Governance
Registration history:
- 14 February 1994: Standard registration
- 17 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 17 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1033092 WEST DERBY WOMEN'S CLUB
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.85k | £3.00k | £2.30k | £2.49k | £1.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.99k | £2.99k | £2.26k | £2.80k | £1.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 April 2021 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 29 August 2019 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/12/1993 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR WOMEN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
KNOTTY ASH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window