COMBS VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF COMBS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME, WITH THE SAID OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,007 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 14 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL ANTHONY EVANSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stuart Wilson | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Curtin | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Antony Evanson | Trustee | 06 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL A EVANSON | Trustee | 01 January 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.39k | £19.45k | £19.87k | £11.93k | £13.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.65k | £6.34k | £7.57k | £26.46k | £15.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £11.27k | £9.67k | £10.01k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF COMBS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURETIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF COMBS CHAPEL-EN-LE-FRITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRCROFT
COMBS ROAD
CHAPEL-EN-LE-FRITH
HIGH PEAK
SK23 9UW
- Phone:
- 01298815030
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window