HILL VIEW PRE-SCHOOL (BANBURY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a safe secure setting for children aged between 3 and 4 years old to help them with learning activities which will help them transfer to mainstream school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 24 February 1994: Standard registration
- 19 June 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HILL VIEW PRESCHOOL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.71k | £41.28k | £55.12k | £51.26k | £67.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.75k | £40.41k | £45.21k | £56.53k | £58.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 08 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | 15 April 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 29 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | 02 March 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | 06 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | 22 July 2011 | 52 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 17 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | 17 May 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 4 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY; (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OF ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF SUCH NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window