THE TEMPLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the Trust is to preserve for the benefit of the nation at large, whatever of its heritage that may exist in England and Wales in the form of buildings and land of particular beauty or historical, architectural or constructional interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUZANNAH FLEMING | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Kate Clive-Powell | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID ELLIS | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
Cristian Elliot Beadman | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
EDWARD LOCKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PIERS INGALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34 | £3.02k | £1.00k | £1.08k | £1.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.44k | £1.71k | £2.42k | £2.85k | £5.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 December 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OF HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 COLLEGE ROAD
ISLEWORTH
TW7 5DP
- Phone:
- 02085607355
- Email:
- edward.locke@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window