Accounts and annual returns VALE OF BELVOIR LIONS CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1033280
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 03 March 2020 On Time