Financial history VALE OF BELVOIR LIONS CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1033280
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £19.97k £23.52k £26.33k £18.06k £6.20k
Total expenditure £17.30k £23.59k £24.86k £20.36k £5.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A