Financial history SHOLING COMMUNITY CENTRE PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1033297
Charity reporting is up to date (164 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £83.32k £100.84k £99.25k £91.59k £110.12k
Total expenditure £91.08k £86.66k £105.54k £103.09k £96.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £102.96k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A