Financial history LONG FURLONG BUGGY CLUB

Charity Number: 1033314
Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023
Total gross income £1.41k £1.17k £0 £1.88k £1.87k
Total expenditure £1.56k £1.30k £282 £1.40k £923
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A