Financial history MARSH GIBBON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1033338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £120.54k £109.29k £129.99k £150.94k £187.43k
Total expenditure £122.84k £105.79k £124.18k £151.91k £164.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A £1.50k £2.60k N/A