FERRUM LODGE NUMBER 1848 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations are provided by members of the Ferrum Lodge, the majority of whom reside within 30 miles of Teesside. The Trust Deed provides that the proceeds are remitted to the named central Masonic Charities (defined as Poverty Charities) for their disposal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurence Andrew Morley | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
GORDON LESLIE MALLORY | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|||||
EDMUND BREWIS LEVIE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.18k | £3.51k | £3.65k | £2.37k | £2.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £351 | £3.00k | £1.50k | £750 | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 DECEMBER 1958. AS AMENDED ON 21 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO THE CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS DESCRIBED IN THE SCHEDULE, SUCH OTHER MASONIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, OR OTHER LOCAL REGISTERED CHARITIES OPERATING IN THE GEOGRAPHIC AREA OF THE MASONIC PROVINCE OF YORKSHIRE NORTH AND EAST RIDINGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 Mallowdale
Nunthorpe
Marton-in-Cleveland
Middlesbrough
TS7 8PP
- Phone:
- 01642324870
- Email:
- e.levie@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window