HILLTOP PRE-SCHOOL N10

Charity number: 1033456
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDES PRESCHOOL EDUCATION TO CHILDREN FROM THE AGES OF 2 YEARS AND 4 MONTHS TILL RECEPTION

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020

Total income: £37,149
Total expenditure: £35,284

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 1994: Standard registration
  • 04 November 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HILLTOP PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £36.43k £31.77k £33.20k £48.81k £37.15k
Total expenditure £39.91k £37.19k £35.09k £40.27k £35.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.15k £0 N/A £25.05k £17.75k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 October 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 June 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 05 March 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On Time